McCoy et al v. Colorado Springs Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Leila McCoy, Corey Robinson and Clyde McCoy, II
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing & Urbdevelopment, Colorado Sprins Housing Authority, Nadine Garcia, Lisa Pachecco, Shawna Carpenter, Colorado Springs Housing Authority and North Platte Housing Authority
Case Number: 4:2018cv03137
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Remark - Public: Pro Se filing access for plaintiff Leila McCoy removed on 8/26/21. Case is closed and appeal time ended. (JLS)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER - Motions #24 and #25 appear to have been filed in the incorrect case. Motion Deadlines are terminated. Motions to be refiled in case 8:20CV363. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
September 16, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED MOTION to Amend CIVIL COMPLAINT on behalf of Plaintiff Leila McCoy.(McCoy, Leila)
September 16, 2020 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Amend CIVIL COMPLAINT on behalf of Plaintiff Leila McCoy.(McCoy, Leila)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Clyde McCoy II at c/o General Delivery, North Platte, NE 69101 regarding Memorandum and Order #20 and Judgment - Pro Se #21 . Mail not resent no forwarding address. (LKO)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Clyde McCoy II regarding Memorandum and Order #19 . Mail returned as unclaimed and unable to forward. Mail not resent. (TCL)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT - PRO SE - This case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute this matter diligently and for failure to comply with this court's orders. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute this matter diligently and for failure to comply with this courts orders. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint that states a claim upon which relief may be granted on or before March 6, 2019. Failure to file an Amended Complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The court will conduct further review of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff has set forth a plausible claim of retaliation under the Fair Housing Act, as amended, and such claim shall go forward after the court reviews Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's "HUD Regulations/HCV Program" claim is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted because there is no implied private right of action under Title II, Section 8, of the Housing and Community Development Act of 1974, Pub. L. No. 93-383, 88 Stat. 633. Plaintiff shall not include such a claim in his Amended Complaint. Leila McCoy's Motion to be Kept on Case as Plaintiff (Filing No. #9 ) is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: March 6, 2019: check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
December 11, 2018 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Corey Robinson at 414 East 6th Street, North Platte, NE 69101 regarding Memorandum and Order #16 . Mail not resent no forwarding address. (LKO)
November 29, 2018 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT COMPLAINT regarding Complaint - Pro Se #1 on behalf of Plaintiff Clyde McCoy, II. (TCL)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Add a Respondent/Dependent (FilingNo. #15 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall add as Defendants in this case those listed on page 1 of Plaintiff's Motion (Filing No. #15 at CM/ECF p. 1). The Clerk of Court shall file a photocopy of Filing No. 15 and docket it as a Supplemental Complaint. Plaintiff shall not file any further amendments to his Complaint until after the court has conducted an initial review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend Complaint - Pro Se #1 on behalf of Plaintiff Clyde McCoy, II. (LKO)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address on behalf of Plaintiff Clyde McCoy, II. (LKO)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address on behalf of Plaintiff Leila McCoy. (LKO)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Corey Robinson at 414 East 6th St, North Platte, NE 69101 regarding Memorandum and Order #11 . Mail not resent no forwarding address. (LKO)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Plaintiff's unsigned Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (FilingNo. #2 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Clyde McCoy, II. (LKO)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to be kept on case as Plaintiff on behalf of Plaintiff Leila McCoy. (LKO)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - By November 30, 2018, Plaintiff Clyde McCoy II must either file a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (or Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) or pay the court's $400.00 filing and administrative fees. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff Clyde McCoy II the Form AO 240, "Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit." The Clerk of Court shall remove Leila McCoy and Corey Robinson asPlaintiffs in this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: November 30, 2018deadline for Plaintiff Clyde McCoy II to file new IFP application or pay filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Corey Robinson at 414 E 6th Street, North Platte NE regarding Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) #3 and Order - Pro Se GO 2016-02 #4 . Mail not resent, no forwarding address. (LKO)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Corey Robinson at 414 East 6th Street, North Platte, NE regarding MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 and Notice of Deficiency (No Signature) 5 . Mail not resent no forwarding address. (LKO)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY by Deputy Clerk that the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 has been filed and is considered deficient because the document is not signed. The plaintiff, Clyde McCoy, II shall correct the deficiency within 15 days of the date of this entry or the pleading may be stricken from the record of this case. See NECivR 11.1.(TCL)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LKO)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Clyde McCoy, II. (LKO)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Colorado Sprins Housing Authority, Nadine Garcia, Lisa Pachecco and U.S. Department of Housing & Urbdevelopment filed on behalf of Clyde McCoy, II. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy et al v. Colorado Springs Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde McCoy, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing & Urbdevelopment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Sprins Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Pachecco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawna Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Springs Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Platte Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?