Khedir Al-Tiae, M.D. v. The Physician Network et al

Plaintiff: Tareq A. Khedir Al-Tiae, M.D.
Defendant: The Physician Network and Catholic Health Initiatives
Case Number: 4:2018cv03140
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
1 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 for attorney Katharine K. Sangha. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3789637 by Attorney Katharine K. Sangha on behalf of Defendants Catholic Health Initiatives, The Physician Network.(Sangha, Katharine)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney Christopher L. Johnson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Johnson Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3787535 by Attorney Christopher L. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Catholic Health Initiatives, The Physician Network.(Johnson, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION for More Definite Statement regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 #6 by Attorney Matthew V. Rusch on behalf of Defendants Catholic Health Initiatives, The Physician Network.(Rusch, Matthew)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for More Definite Statement regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Attorney Matthew V. Rusch on behalf of Defendants Catholic Health Initiatives, The Physician Network.(Rusch, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Due to clerical error, this case was incorrectly assigned to District Judge John M. Gerrard. Accordingly, this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition. Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson will remain as the referral judge for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Christopher L. Johnson has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Katharine K. Sangha has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Defendants from Lancaster County District Court, Case number 18-2755 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3782498) with attached state court pleadingsCatholic Health Initiatives, The Physician Network (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings)(Rusch, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khedir Al-Tiae, M.D. v. The Physician Network et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tareq A. Khedir Al-Tiae, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Physician Network
Represented By: Matthew V. Rusch
Represented By: Katharine K. Sangha
Represented By: Christopher L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives
Represented By: Matthew V. Rusch
Represented By: Katharine K. Sangha
Represented By: Christopher L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?