Doe v. University of Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: University of Nebraska and University of Nebraska Board of Regents
Case Number: 4:2018cv03142
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously and for Protective Order. The parties shall govern themselves in accordance with the terms set forth in the motion #9 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION Proceed pseudonymously and protective order by Attorney Matthew J. Donnelly on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe.(Donnelly, Matthew)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING LETTER - In completing the required Rule 26(f) Report, counsel should use the revised Form 35 ("Rule 26(f) Report") posted on the Court's website. The Rule 26(f) Report should be filed with the Court no later than December 19, 2018. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a case management deadline using the following text: "December 19, 2018 check for Rule 26(f) Report." Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by University of Nebraska, University of Nebraska Board of Regents (Sapp, Susan)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #5 for attorney Matthew J. Donnelly. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3787576 by Attorney Matthew J. Donnelly on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe.(Donnelly, Matthew)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 15, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lily Amare on behalf of Defendants University of Nebraska, University of Nebraska Board of Regents.(Amare, Lily)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against John Doe from District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-2880 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3784319) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Lily Amare on behalf of University of Nebraska, University of Nebraska Board of Regents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit State Removal)(Amare, Lily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. University of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Nebraska
Represented By: Lily Amare
Represented By: Susan K. Sapp
Represented By: Bren H. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Nebraska Board of Regents
Represented By: Lily Amare
Represented By: Susan K. Sapp
Represented By: Bren H. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Roger D. Moore
Represented By: Matthew J. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?