All American Sales, Inc. v. Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC et al

Plaintiff: All American Sales, Inc.
Defendant: Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC and Saia, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03143
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - Counsel shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge by joint or separate letters by 2/5/19 addressing mediation requirements. Planning Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Terri M. Weeks on behalf of Plaintiff All American Sales, Inc..(Weeks, Terri)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Terri M. Weeks on behalf of Plaintiff All American Sales, Inc..(Weeks, Terri)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING LETTER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC, Saia, Inc. (Marcinak, C.)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff All American Sales, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney C. Fredric Marcinak, III on behalf of Defendant Saia, Inc..(Marcinak, C.)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Saia, Inc., Corporate Parent Saia, Inc. for Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC d/b/a Saia LTL Freight. by Attorney C. Fredric Marcinak, III on behalf of Defendants Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC d/b/a Saia LTL Freight, Saia, Inc., Saia, Inc..(Marcinak, C.)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All American Sales, Inc. from County Court, Lancaster County, Case number CI 18-11102 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3785557) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney C. Fredric Marcinak, III on behalf of Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC d/b/a Saia LTL Freight, Saia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marcinak, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All American Sales, Inc. v. Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All American Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Donald H. Bowman
Represented By: Terri M. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC
Represented By: C. Fredric Marcinak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saia, Inc.
Represented By: C. Fredric Marcinak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?