Fry v. Doane University et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Fry
Defendant: Donald Belau, Doane University, Nebraska State Suicide Prevention Coalition and Interchurch Ministries of Nebraska
Case Number: 4:2018cv03145
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant Doane University's Motion to Dismiss #17 by December 31, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Tanya J. Hansen on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer Fry.(Hansen, Tanya)
November 27, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Doane University (Sapp, Susan)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleading. Doane University shall file its answer by November 28, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 26, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave To File Responsive Pleading by Attorney Susan K. Sapp on behalf of Defendant Doane University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sapp, Susan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #17 by Attorney Susan K. Sapp on behalf of Defendant Doane University.(Sapp, Susan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Susan K. Sapp on behalf of Defendant Doane University.(Sapp, Susan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Nebraska State Suicide Prevention Coalition (Haszard, James)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Donald Belau (Creager, Robert)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Nebraska State Suicide Prevention Coalition shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 26, 2018.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney James L. Haszard on behalf of Defendant Nebraska State Suicide Prevention Coalition.(Haszard, James)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney James L. Haszard on behalf of Defendant Nebraska State Suicide Prevention Coalition.(Haszard, James)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney James L. Haszard on behalf of Defendant Nebraska State Suicide Prevention Coalition (Haszard, James)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Due to clerical error, this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Richard G. Kopf for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Donald Belau shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 26, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Doane University shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 26, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Robert B. Creager on behalf of Defendant Donald Belau.(Creager, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Robert B. Creager on behalf of Defendant Donald Belau (Creager, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Nebraska State Suicide Prevention Coalition. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lily Amare on behalf of Defendant Doane University.(Amare, Lily)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Lily Amare on behalf of Defendant Doane University.(Amare, Lily)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Jennifer Fry from District Court of Saline County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-135 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3787338) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Lily Amare on behalf of Doane University (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Pleadings, #2 Exhibit State Removal)(Amare, Lily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fry v. Doane University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Belau
Represented By: Robert B. Creager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doane University
Represented By: Lily Amare
Represented By: Susan K. Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska State Suicide Prevention Coalition
Represented By: James L. Haszard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interchurch Ministries of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Fry
Represented By: Tanya J. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?