Hyde v. Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation

Plaintiff: Taylor Hyde
Defendant: Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation
Case Number: 4:2018cv03163
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Richard G Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Christopher J. Tjaden on behalf of Defendant Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation.(Tjaden, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation (Tjaden, Christopher)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (CS)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond on or before January 31, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLA)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Don V. Kelly. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3838599 by Attorney Don V. Kelly on behalf of Defendant Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation.(Kelly, Don)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Christopher J. Tjaden on behalf of Defendant Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation.(Tjaden, Christopher)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of a Complaint filed on 12/05/2018 of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint #1 .) (LKO)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation regarding Complaint, #1 . (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3816102), by Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz on behalf of Taylor Hyde (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyde v. Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Christopher J. Tjaden
Represented By: Don V. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Hyde
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?