Rodriguez v. Ramirez et al
Plaintiff: Yankiel E. Rodriguez
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, BNSF Railway Company, Ollie R. Ramirez and Amtrak
Case Number: 4:2019cv03002
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: The Final Progression Order, Filing No. 17, Paragraph 2, is amended to reflect the parties' proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit Lists(s) must be emailed to bazis@ned.uscourts.gov, in Word format, by 3:00 p.m. on May 14, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #16 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline is December 13, 2019. The jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, Chief United States District Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on June 15, 2020, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of five (5) trial days. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on May 19, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. A telephonic conference to discuss the status of case progression and the parties' interest in settlement will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on December 4, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Nichole S. Bogen on behalf of Defendants BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Ollie R. Ramirez.(Bogen, Nichole)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Service by Attorney Nichole S. Bogen on behalf of Defendants BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Ollie R. Ramirez.(Bogen, Nichole)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Extend. Mandatory disclosures shall be served by March 29, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Mandatory Disclosure Deadlines by Attorney Nichole S. Bogen on behalf of Defendants BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Ollie R. Ramirez.(Bogen, Nichole)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JAB)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/7/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JAB)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER regarding Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically #8 . Filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is refunded to the payor, Nichole S. Bogen, receipt number ANEDC-3847108. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Nichole S. Bogen on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company.(Bogen, Nichole)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Refund of filing fee paid electronically by Attorney Nichole S. Bogen on behalf of Defendants BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Ollie R. Ramirez.(Bogen, Nichole)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Nichole S. Bogen on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Bogen, Nichole)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KLF)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant BNSF Railway Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KLF)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KLF)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by BNSF Railway Company (Bogen, Nichole)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Ollie R. Ramirez (Bogen, Nichole)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Defendants from County Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18 15207 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNEDC-3847108) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Nichole S. Bogen on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons - Amtrak, #3 Exhibit Summons - BNSF, #4 Exhibit Summons - Ramirez)(Bogen, Nichole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Ramirez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ollie R. Ramirez
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrak
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yankiel E. Rodriguez
Represented By: Steven H. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?