Derkach v. Postell Associates, Inc.

Plaintiff: Brett Derkach
Defendant: Postell Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03008
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - If the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before April 9, 2019, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" located on the court's website at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. After all parties have signed this form, e-mail it in.pdf format to clerk@ned.uscourts.gov. Do not electronically file this form or submit it to chambers. In the absence of timely submitting the attached form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #8 by Attorney Matthew M. Enenbach on behalf of Defendant Postell Associates, Inc..(Enenbach, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #8 by Attorney Matthew M. Enenbach on behalf of Defendant Postell Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit 1-F, #8 Affidavit)(Enenbach, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Matthew M. Enenbach on behalf of Defendant Postell Associates, Inc..(Enenbach, Matthew)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The deadline to file an Answer or other responsive pleading is now March 18, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Matthew M. Enenbach on behalf of Defendant Postell Associates, Inc..(Enenbach, Matthew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Matthew M. Enenbach on behalf of Defendant Postell Associates, Inc..(Enenbach, Matthew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Postell Associates, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Stull, Corey)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Postell Associates, d/b/a G-Force Racing Gear ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3858549), by Attorney Corey L. Stull on behalf of Brett Derkach(Stull, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derkach v. Postell Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Derkach
Represented By: Jeanette L. Stull
Represented By: Corey L. Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postell Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M. Enenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?