Schnuelle v. Midstates Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: David L. Schnuelle
Defendant: Terry W. Arentson, Midstates Bancshares, Inc and Midstates Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03009
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have an extension of time to April 8, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Matthew E. Eck on behalf of Defendants Terry W. Arentson, Midstates Bancshares, Inc, Midstates Bank, N.A..(Eck, Matthew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Matthew E. Eck on behalf of Defendant Midstates Bancshares, Inc.(Eck, Matthew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Midstates Bancshares, Inc. for Midstates Bank, N.A.. by Attorney Matthew E. Eck on behalf of Defendants Midstates Bank, N.A., Midstates Bancshares, Inc..(Eck, Matthew)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Midstates Bancshares, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Midstates Bank, N.A. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have an extension of time to March 29, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Matthew E. Eck on behalf of Defendants Terry W. Arentson, Midstates Bancshares, Inc, Midstates Bank, N.A..(Eck, Matthew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew E. Eck on behalf of Defendants Terry W. Arentson, Midstates Bancshares, Inc, Midstates Bank, N.A. (Eck, Matthew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Donald J. Pavelka, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Terry W. Arentson, Midstates Bancshares, Inc, Midstates Bank, N.A. (Pavelka, Donald)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Midstates Bank, N.A. on 2/11/2019. (KLF)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Midstates Bank, N.A. (KLF)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Midstates Bank, N.A., Terry W. Arentson, and Midstates Bancshares, Inc. 1 Summons issued with receipt number 4007508, in the amount of $400 filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff David L. Schnuelle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schnuelle v. Midstates Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Schnuelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry W. Arentson
Represented By: Donald J. Pavelka, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew E. Eck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midstates Bancshares, Inc
Represented By: Donald J. Pavelka, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew E. Eck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midstates Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Donald J. Pavelka, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew E. Eck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?