Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Orscheln Farm an Home, LLC and Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03013
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 for attorney Andrew Woellner. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice is filed Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3899486 by Attorney Andrew A. Woellner on behalf of Plaintiff Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Woellner, Andrew)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 is filed by Attorney Christopher D. Lindstrom on behalf of Plaintiff Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC.(Lindstrom, Christopher)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Orscheln Farm an Home, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Affiliated FM Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3865495), by Attorney Christopher D. Lindstrom on behalf of Orscheln Farm an Home, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lindstrom, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orscheln Farm an Home, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Lindstrom
Represented By: Andrew A. Woellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?