Harkins v. GC Services Limited Partnership et al

Plaintiff: Marvin Harkins
Defendant: John Does 1-25 and GC Services Limited Partnership
Case Number: 4:2019cv03015
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The deadline for GC Services Limited Partnership to file an answer or respond to the Complaint is extended to May 6, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Kelly N. Wyman on behalf of Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership.(Wyman, Kelly)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kelly N. Wyman on behalf of Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership (Wyman, Kelly)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant GC Services Limited Partnership on 3/15/2019. (Saks, Yaakov)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to defendant GC Services Limited Partnership regarding Complaint, #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JAB)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned as presider. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JAB)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against GC Services Limited Partnership, John Does 1-25 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3874688), by Attorney Yaakov Saks on behalf of MARVIN HARKINS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 SUMMONS)(Saks, Yaakov)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harkins v. GC Services Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Services Limited Partnership
Represented By: Kelly N. Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Harkins
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?