Czyz v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: John Czyz
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03020
Filed: March 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/19/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Ostroff, Ethan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ethan G. Ostroff on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Ostroff, Ethan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement 5 is stricken for the following reason: Document has been filed as attachment #3 to filing #1 . Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 *STRICKEN* TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO) Modified on 3/12/2019 to strike per strike order (LKO).
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Ryan K. Forrest has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael F. Polk has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
March 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
March 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against John Czyz from District Court of Douglas County, Case number CI 19 958 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3886859) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Ryan K. Forrest on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Case Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Submission From Sender Rule 7.1 Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Forrest, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Czyz v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Czyz
Represented By: Michael F. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Ryan K. Forrest
Represented By: Ethan G. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?