Gilliard et al v. Limitless Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tracey L. Gilliard, AAA Enterprises, Inc. and Rebecca Gilliard
Defendant: John M. Sullivan, Janusz Czernek, Totran Transportation Services, Inc. and Limitless Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03044
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/19/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Limitless Logistics, Inc. (Reilly, Matthew)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A Telephone Conference is set for June 19, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge. The parties shall use the case conference instructions which will be assigned to this case to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. CEW)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Attorney Catherine T. Barnard on behalf of Defendant Totran Transportation Services, Inc. (Barnard, Catherine)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 for Plaintiff AAA Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a AAA Rents, by Attorney Matthew J. Knowles on behalf of Plaintiff AAA Enterprises, Inc..(Knowles, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Matthew B. Reilly on behalf of Defendant Limitless Logistics, Inc..(Reilly, Matthew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Limitless Logistics, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff AAA Enterprises, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney James W. Knowles, Jr. has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Beata Shapiro has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Totran Transportation Services, Inc. for Totran Transportation Services, Inc.. by Attorney Catherine T. Barnard on behalf of Defendants John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc., Totran Transportation Services, Inc..(Barnard, Catherine)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney Catherine T. Barnard on behalf of Defendants John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc..(Barnard, Catherine)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc. (Barnard, Catherine)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet by Attorney Catherine T. Barnard on behalf of Defendants John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc. (Barnard, Catherine)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc. from In the District Court of Buffalo County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-0000110 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3936696) with attached state court pleadingsJohn M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Barnard, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliard et al v. Limitless Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey L. Gilliard
Represented By: Matthew J. Knowles
Represented By: James W. Knowles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAA Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Knowles
Represented By: James W. Knowles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Gilliard
Represented By: Matthew J. Knowles
Represented By: James W. Knowles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Sullivan
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Represented By: Catherine T. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janusz Czernek
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Totran Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Represented By: Catherine T. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limitless Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?