Lecher-Zapata v. QBE Insurance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: John Lecher-Zapata and John Zapata
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation, Nolan, Olson & Stryker, P.C. L.L.O., Julie A. Martin, Adelson, Testan, Brundo & Jimenez, Brian D. Nolan and Rubina Khaleel
Case Number: 4:2019cv03053
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Remark - Public: Mr. Zapata's name was changed on this case to John Zapata to match his PACER login. The name John Lecher-Zapata also remains on the case as it was listed on the Complaint #1 . (JLS)
July 30, 2019 Filing 28 CM/ECF NextGen e-filing request from pro se party John Lecher-Zapata access granted on 7/30/19. (JLS)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to extend (filing #25 ) is granted. The plaintiff may respond to the defendants' pending motions to dismiss (filing #11 ; filing #14 ; filing #16 ) on or before August 30, 2019. The defendants may reply in support of their respective motions on or before September 6, 2019. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading on behalf of Plaintiff John Lecher-Zapata. (LKO)
July 24, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Adelson, Testan, Brundo & Jimenez. Original given to plaintiff for service. (LKO)
July 24, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Adelson, Testan, Brundo & Jimenez. (LKO)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jacqueline M. DeLuca on behalf of Defendant Julie A. Martin.(DeLuca, Jacqueline)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jacqueline M. DeLuca on behalf of Defendant Brian D. Nolan.(DeLuca, Jacqueline)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jacqueline M. DeLuca on behalf of Defendant Nolan, Olson & Stryker, P.C. L.L.O..(DeLuca, Jacqueline)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Tory M. Bishop on behalf of Defendant QBE Insurance Corporation.(Bishop, Tory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #16 by Attorney Tory M. Bishop on behalf of Defendant QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Brooke H. McCarthy, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit 1-F, #8 Exhibit 1-G)(Bishop, Tory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #16 by Attorney Tory M. Bishop on behalf of Defendant QBE Insurance Corporation.(Bishop, Tory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Tory M. Bishop on behalf of Defendant QBE Insurance Corporation.(Bishop, Tory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #14 by Attorney Jacqueline M. DeLuca on behalf of Defendant Nolan, Olson & Stryker, P.C. L.L.O.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Evidence)(DeLuca, Jacqueline)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Jacqueline M. DeLuca on behalf of Defendant Nolan, Olson & Stryker, P.C. L.L.O..(DeLuca, Jacqueline)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Julie A. Martin; Brian D. Nolan; and Nolan, Olson & Stryker, P.C. L.L.O. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #11 by Attorney Matthew B. Reilly on behalf of Defendants Adelson, Testan, Brundo & Jimenez, Rubina Khaleel.(Reilly, Matthew)
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Matthew B. Reilly on behalf of Defendants Adelson, Testan, Brundo & Jimenez, Rubina Khaleel.(Reilly, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jacqueline M. DeLuca on behalf of Defendant Nolan, Olson & Stryker, P.C. L.L.O..(DeLuca, Jacqueline)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. QBE Insurance Corporation shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Tory M. Bishop on behalf of Defendant QBE Insurance Corporation.(Bishop, Tory)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - that the plaintiff's motion for a progression order (filing #6 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Progression Order on behalf of Plaintiff John Lecher-Zapata. (LKO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant QBE Insurance Corporation on 6/10/2019. (LKO)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendants Adelson, Testan, Brundo & Jimenez, Rubina Khaleel, Julie A. Martin, Brian D. Nolan, Nolan, Olson & Stryker, P.C. L.L.O., and QBE Insurance Corporation. Originals given to pro se plaintiff for service. (LKO)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Adelson, Testan, Brundo & Jimenez, Rubina Khaleel, Julie A. Martin, Brian D. Nolan, Nolan, Olson & Stryker, P.C. L.L.O., and QBE Insurance Corporation, with receipt number 4007590, in the amount of $400; filed on behalf of John Lecher-Zapata. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lecher-Zapata v. QBE Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Tory M. Bishop
Represented By: Brooke H. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan, Olson & Stryker, P.C. L.L.O.
Represented By: Jacqueline M. DeLuca
Represented By: Mark C. Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A. Martin
Represented By: Jacqueline M. DeLuca
Represented By: Mark C. Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelson, Testan, Brundo & Jimenez
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D. Nolan
Represented By: Jacqueline M. DeLuca
Represented By: Mark C. Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubina Khaleel
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lecher-Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?