Mohnsen v. Educational Service Unit No. 1 et al
Plaintiff: Kerri Mohnsen
Defendant: Educational Service Unit No. 1, Edward Stansberry, Stuart Clark, William Heimann and Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013)
Case Number: 4:2019cv03061
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline is now set for September 3, 2019. On or before August 23, 2019, a party shall contact the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge to set a conference call if: 1. One or more of the parties believes a planning conference is needed to complete the Rule 26(f) Report; or 2. The parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the Rule 26(f) Report; or 3. The parties are currently and actively pursuing settlement and believe preparing and filing a Rule 26(f) Report may be unnecessary. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint regarding: Order on Motion to Amend, 20 by Edward Stansberry, Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013) (Wilbrand, Charles)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 The parties' Joint Stipulation to Amend Answer. Defendants Walthill Public Schools and Edward Stansberry shall file their Amended Answer on or before August 16, 2019. The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set in Filing No. #17 is continued until further order of this court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.(CEW)
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT MOTION to Amend Answer by Attorney Charles E. Wilbrand on behalf of Defendants Edward Stansberry, Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013).(Wilbrand, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #3 by Stuart Clark, Educational Service Unit No. 1, William Heimann (Goyette, Randall)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Educational Service Unit No. 1 on 6/24/2019. (Neary, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Stuart Clark on 6/24/2019. (Neary, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013) on 6/21/2019. (Neary, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant William Heimann on 6/24/2019. (Neary, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Edward Stansberry defendant Edward Stansberry on 6/20/2019. (Neary, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #3 by Edward Stansberry, Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013) (Wilbrand, Charles)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to defendants Stuart Clark, Educational Service Unit No. 1, William Heimann, Edward Stansberry, and Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013). YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Edward Stansberry regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Neary, Kathleen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to William Heimann regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Neary, Kathleen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Stuart Clark regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Neary, Kathleen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013) regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Neary, Kathleen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Educational Service Unit No. 1 regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Neary, Kathleen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Kerri Mohnsen(Neary, Kathleen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3963397), by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Kerri Mohnsen(Neary, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohnsen v. Educational Service Unit No. 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri Mohnsen
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Service Unit No. 1
Represented By: Randall L. Goyette
Represented By: Christopher M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Stansberry
Represented By: Jeanelle R. Lust
Represented By: Charles E. Wilbrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Clark
Represented By: Randall L. Goyette
Represented By: Christopher M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Heimann
Represented By: Randall L. Goyette
Represented By: Christopher M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013)
Represented By: Jeanelle R. Lust
Represented By: Charles E. Wilbrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?