Gray v. Nebraska Department of Correctional Services et al
Plaintiff: Graylin Gray
Defendant: Harbans Deol, Scott R. Frakes, Does 1-20 and Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Case Number: 4:2019cv03063
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment (filing no. #11 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend or Alter Judgment - Pro Se #10 on behalf of Plaintiff Graylin Gray. (LKO)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT - PRO SE - This case is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons set forth in the corresponding Memorandum and Order entered on this date. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff Graylin Gray must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #2 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. #4 ) is denied as moot. This case is dismissed without prejudice and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE regarding Memorandum and Order (Show Cause) #7 on behalf of Plaintiff Graylin Gray. (LKO)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff has 30 days to either show cause for why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) or pay the courts $400.00 filing and administrative fees. The clerk;s office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 24, 2019: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Graylin Gray. (ADB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Graylin Gray. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (ADB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Graylin Gray. (ADB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Harbans Deol, Does 1-20, Scott R. Frakes, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services; no Summons(es) issued ; filed on behalf of Graylin Gray. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Nebraska Department of Correctional Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graylin Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbans Deol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?