Lohman et al v. Rucker et al
Plaintiff: Michael L Lohman and Haley M Lohman
Defendant: Aaron Rucker and Chad Borgmann
Case Number: 4:2019cv03064
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have an extension of time to August 30, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Christine M. Kroupa on behalf of Defendants Chad Borgmann, Aaron Rucker.(Kroupa, Christine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Aaron Rucker. Waiver sent on 6/24/2019. (Sipple, Adam)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Chad Borgmann. Waiver sent on 6/24/2019. (Sipple, Adam)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNEDC-3965862), by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Michael L Lohman, Haley M Lohman(Sipple, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lohman et al v. Rucker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Rucker
Represented By: Christine M. Kroupa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Borgmann
Represented By: Christine M. Kroupa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L Lohman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley M Lohman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?