Krei v. State of Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: Kalem Krei and Kadence Krei
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Health & Human Services, State of Nebraska, Nebraska Department of Administrative Services, Dannette R. Smith and Jason Jackson
Case Number: 4:2019cv03068
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Buescher, for disposition. The magistrate judge remains assigned to the case for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (JLS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Jason Jackson, State of Nebraska, and Dannette R. Smith. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to State of Nebraska regarding Amended Complaint, #2 . (Napolitano, Susan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Dannette R. Smith regarding Amended Complaint, #2 . (Napolitano, Susan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Jason Jackson regarding Amended Complaint, #2 . (Napolitano, Susan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendants Kadence Krei, State of Nebraska, Dannette R. Smith, and Jason Jackson by Attorney Susan M. Napolitano on behalf of Kadence Krei (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Napolitano, Susan) Modified on 7/11/2019 to reflect all correct parties (LKO).
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3973923), by Attorney Susan M. Napolitano on behalf of Kalem Krei(Napolitano, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krei v. State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Administrative Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dannette R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalem Krei
Represented By: Susan M. Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kadence Krei
Represented By: Susan M. Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?