Henderson State Bank v. Universal Herbs, LLC
Plaintiff: Henderson State Bank
Defendant: Universal Herbs, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03070
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
2 Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Response Deadline by Attorney Jeremiah C. Hollembeak on behalf of Plaintiff Henderson State Bank.(Hollembeak, Jeremiah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney John Alonso Hutchings on behalf of Defendant Universal Herbs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark Ray)(Hutchings, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Jeremiah Hollembeak. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3994582 by Attorney Jeremiah C. Hollembeak on behalf of Plaintiff Henderson State Bank.(Hollembeak, Jeremiah)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Universal Herbs, LLC, c/o Mark David Ray, Registered Agent defendant Henderson State Bank on 7/26/2019. (Ashby, Thomas)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Registered Agent Mark David Ray for Universal Herbs, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Universal Herbs, LLC defendant Henderson State Bank on 7/16/2019. (Ashby, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Defendant, Universal Herbs, LLC c/o Mark David Ray, Registered Agent regarding Complaint #1 . (Ashby, Thomas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Universal Herbs, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Defendant, Universal Herbs, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Ashby, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - This case is related to case no. 4:18-cv-3171. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Richard G. Kopf for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Henderson State Company, Corporate Parent Henderson State Company for Henderson State Bank. by Attorney Thomas O. Ashby on behalf of Plaintiffs Henderson State Bank, Henderson State Company, Henderson State Company.(Ashby, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Henderson State Bank. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Universal Herbs, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3974758), by Attorney Thomas O. Ashby on behalf of Henderson State Bank(Ashby, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson State Bank v. Universal Herbs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Herbs, LLC
Represented By: John Alonso Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henderson State Bank
Represented By: Thomas O. Ashby
Represented By: Jeremiah C. Hollembeak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?