Calderon v. Frakes
Petitioner: Raul Calderon
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2019cv03073
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (filing no. #6 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time (filing no. #7 ) is granted. No further extensions shall be granted. Petitioner shall have until September 30, 2019, to file an amended petition in accordance with the court's July 25, 2019 Memorandum and Order (filing no. #5 ). Petitioner is encouraged to use the official Form AO 241 previously provided to him. To avoid confusion, any document Petitioner sends to the clerk of the court for filing in this case must clearly display the case number. Failure to file an amended petition will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 30, 2019: Check for amended petition. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend on behalf of Petitioner Raul Calderon. (2 exact copies received) (LKO)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Petitioner Raul Calderon. (LKO)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The pending Petition (filing no. #1 ) is deemed insufficient and the court will not act upon it. By August 26, 2019, Petitioner shall file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus that is originally signed under penalty of perjury. Petitioner is encouraged to use the enclosed official Form AO 241. To avoid confusion, any document Petitioner sends to the clerk of the court for filing in this case must clearly display the case number. Failure to file an amended petition in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO 241 ("Petition for Relief From a Conviction or Sentence By a Person in State Custody"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: August 26, 2019: Check for amended petition. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (filing no. #2 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion after Petitioner files an amended petition in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with Form AO 241)(LKO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 22, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of Raul Calderon on 7/22/19. Receipt number 4007614, in the amount of $5.00. (LKO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to appoint counsel on behalf of Petitioner Raul Calderon. (LKO) Modified on 7/22/2019 to reflect correct event type (LKO).
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus with receipt number 4007614, in the amount of $5 filed by pro se petitioner Raul Calderon. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calderon v. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raul Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?