AAA Enterprises, Inc. v. Totran Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AAA Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: John M. Sullivan and Totran Transportation Services, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Janusz Czernek and Limitless Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03074
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
2 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due August 31, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for 12/29/2020 at 10:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Status Conference to discuss the status of case progression and the parties' interest in settlement is set for 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Status Conference to discuss the status of case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and potential trial settings is set for 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Member Cases: 4:19-cv-03044-BCB-CRZ, 4:19-cv-03074-BCB-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Matthew J. Knowles on behalf of Plaintiff Tracey L. Gilliard.Member Cases: 4:19-cv-03044-BCB-CRZ, 4:19-cv-03074-BCB-CRZ(Knowles, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Buescher, for disposition. The magistrate judge remains assigned to the case for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. Member Cases: 4:19-cv-03044-JMG-CRZ, 4:19-cv-03074-JMG-CRZ(JLS)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Christopher D. Jerram on behalf of Plaintiff AAA Enterprises, Inc..(Jerram, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Totran Transportation Services, Inc. by Janusz Czernek, Limitless Logistics, Inc. (Reilly, Matthew)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER in case 4:19-cv-03044-JMG-CRZ; granting (11) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:19-cv-03074-JMG-CRZ and the cases are consolidated for discovery and pretrial preparation. 4:19-cv-3044, Gilliard et al v. Limitless Logistics, Inc. et al is hereby designated as the "Lead Case," and 4:19-cv-3074 AAA Enterprises, Inc. v. Totran Transportation Services, Inc. et al is designated as a "Member Case." The Rule 26 Meeting Report deadline of September 19, 2019, set in4:19-cv-3044, Gilliard et al v. Limitless Logistics, Inc. et al, (SeeFiling No. 17) now also applies to 4:19-cv-3074 AAA Enterprises,Inc. v. Totran Transportation Services, Inc. et al. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand , CROSSCLAIM with jury demand against John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc. regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 filed by John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc. by John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc. (Barnard, Catherine)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc. (Barnard, Catherine)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Case(s) 4:19-cv-03044-JMG-CRZ by Attorney Catherine T. Barnard on behalf of Defendants John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc..(Barnard, Catherine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Beata Shapiro has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KMM)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant John M. Sullivan. Waiver sent on 7/18/2019. (Barnard, Catherine)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision and remains assigned to Chief District Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 . Civil Cover Sheet by Attorney Catherine T. Barnard on behalf of Defendants John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc..(Barnard, Catherine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Catherine T. Barnard on behalf of Defendants John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc..(Barnard, Catherine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Totran Transportation Services, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Limitless Logistics, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff AAA Enterprises, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against John M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc., Limitless Logistics, Inc., Janusz Czernek from Buffalo County District Court, Case number CI 16-81 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3984115) with attached state court pleadingsJohn M. Sullivan, Totran Transportation Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Barnard, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AAA Enterprises, Inc. v. Totran Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAA Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Gibbons
Represented By: Christopher D. Jerram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Sullivan
Represented By: Brian Del Gatto
Represented By: Catherine T. Barnard
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Totran Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Del Gatto
Represented By: Catherine T. Barnard
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Janusz Czernek
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Limitless Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?