Door v. Capps et al
Plaintiff: Duop Door
Defendant: Michelle Capps, Brandy Logston and Matthew Heckman
Case Number: 4:2019cv03085
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. In the absence of cause shown, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: November 14, 2019: check for response to show cause order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #8 ; filing no. #9 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $15.82 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 11, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Plaintiff's institution; e-mailed to Finance) (KLF)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Duop Door. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (KLF)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Duop Door. (KLF)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Duop Door. (KLF)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Duop Door 75432, Nebraska Department of Corrections, P.O. Box 22500, Lincoln, NE 68542-2500 regarding Memorandum and Order #5 . Mail resent to Hall County Jail, 110 Public Safety Drive, Grand Island, NE 68801 along with AO Form. (KLF)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Duop Door at Nebraska Department of Corrections regarding Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) #3 and Order - Pro Se GO 2016-02 #4 . Mail resent to Duop Door at Hall County Jail. (LKO)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 23, 2019: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with Form AO240) (KLF)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Duop Door. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (KLF)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michelle Capps, Matthew Heckman, and Brandy Logston filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Duop Door. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Door v. Capps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Logston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Heckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duop Door
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?