Bohling v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bohling
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03087
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIPT of Remanded case by the District Court of Johnson County, Nebraska. (LKO)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 Transmittal Letter sending certified copies of the Memorandum and Order (Remand Order) #9 , Judgment #10 , and docket sheet to the District Court of Johnson County, Nebraska, case number CI19-70. (LKO)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the accompanying memorandum and order, judgment is hereby entered in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a), and this case is remanded to the District Court of Johnson County, Nebraska. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's motion for leave to amend her complaint (filing #7 ) is granted. The plaintiff's second amended complaint (filing #7 -1) is hereby deemed filed. The defendant's motion to dismiss (filing #4 ) is denied as moot, without prejudice to reassertion. The plaintiff's motion to remand (filing #8 ) is granted. This case is remanded to the District Court of Johnson County, Nebraska. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Bohling.(Shiffermiller, Joy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Bohling. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint)(Shiffermiller, Joy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 INDEX in support of Brief #5 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #4 by Attorney Marcia A. Washkuhn on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Marcia A. Washkuhn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Washkuhn, Marcia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #4 by Attorney Marcia A. Washkuhn on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc..(Washkuhn, Marcia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Marcia A. Washkuhn on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc..(Washkuhn, Marcia)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Kimberly Bohling from District Court of Johnson County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-70 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4008782) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Marcia A. Washkuhn on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Washkuhn, Marcia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohling v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bohling
Represented By: Joy A. Shiffermiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Marcia A. Washkuhn
Represented By: Meaghan M. Gandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?