Schneider v. Cenergistic LLC
Plaintiff: Allison J. Schneider
Defendant: Cenergistic LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03088
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Change Venue or, Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss #16 by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Cenergistic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rebecca Uhr, #2 Exhibit A - Executed Offer Letter)(Balus, Allison)
October 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Change Venue or, Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Cenergistic LLC.(Balus, Allison)
October 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Allison D. Balus on behalf of Defendant Cenergistic LLC (Balus, Allison)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Bonnie Boryca and the law firm of Erickson & Sederstrom PC is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendant, which remains represented by other counsel. Ms. Boryca shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 CM/ECF NextGen e-filing request from pro se plaintiff Allison J. Schneider. Access granted on 10/3/19. (JLS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Bonnie M. Boryca on behalf of Defendant Cenergistic LLC.(Boryca, Bonnie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Bonnie M. Boryca on behalf of Defendant Cenergistic LLC.(Boryca, Bonnie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Cenergistic LLC on 9/9/2019. (ADB)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Cenergistic LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Cenergistic LLC shall file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint on or before October 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(SMN)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Bonnie M. Boryca on behalf of Defendant Cenergistic LLC.(Boryca, Bonnie)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Bonnie M. Boryca on behalf of Defendant Cenergistic LLC (Boryca, Bonnie)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #4 for attorney Henry Robinson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4023464 by Attorney Henry H. Robinson on behalf of Defendant Cenergistic LLC.(Robinson, Henry)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (TCL)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Cenergistic LLC. (TCL)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cenergistic LLC. One Summons issued, with receipt number 4-7638, in the amount of $ 400 filed on behalf of Allison J. Schneider(TCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. Cenergistic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenergistic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?