Hartman v. City of Lincoln, Nebraska
Plaintiff: Abby Hartman
Defendant: City of Lincoln and City of Lincoln, Nebraska
Case Number: 4:2019cv03100
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jocelyn W. Golden on behalf of Defendant City of Lincoln, Nebraska.(Golden, Jocelyn)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/19/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT the motion to dismiss, Filing No. #3 , is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #9 by City of Lincoln, Nebraska (Golden, Jocelyn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand (Second Amended Complaint) against Defendant City of Lincoln, Nebraska, by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Abby Hartman(Neary, Kathleen) Modified on 11/15/2019 to add "second". (JAB)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Unopposed motion to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint, a copy of which is attached to the motion, shall be filed on or before November 13, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend Complaint and Certificate of Service by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Plaintiff Abby Hartman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Neary, Kathleen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (ADB)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: If the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before November 1, 2019, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" located on the court's website at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. After all parties have signed this form, e-mail it in.pdf format to clerk@ned.uscourts.gov. Do not electronically file this form or submit it to chambers. In the absence of timely submitting the attached form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS IN PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #3 by Attorney Jocelyn W. Golden on behalf of Defendants City of Lincoln, Nebraska, City of Lincoln, Nebraska.(Golden, Jocelyn)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS IN PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Attorney Jocelyn W. Golden on behalf of Defendants City of Lincoln, Nebraska, City of Lincoln, Nebraska.(Golden, Jocelyn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Abby Hartman from Lancaster County District Court, Case number CI 19-1078 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4033585) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jocelyn W. Golden on behalf of City of Lincoln (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, Jury Demand & Praecipe, #3 Exhibit C - Service Return on City of Lincoln)(Golden, Jocelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartman v. City of Lincoln, Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Hartman
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Represented By: Vincent M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lincoln
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lincoln, Nebraska
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?