Scalia v. Vasquez Drywall et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: Vasquez Drywall and Manuel Vasquez
Case Number: 4:2019cv03104
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendants Manuel Vasquez on 12/10/2019; Vasquez Drywall on 12/10/2019. (ADB)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Manuel Vasquez and Vasquez Drywall. Summons and USM-285 form provided to the USM for service per Order #4 . (LKO)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Vasquez Drywall and Manuel Vasquez regarding Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #3 . (Richardson, Boyce)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion Order Directing United States Marshals Service to Serve Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Order Directing United States Marshals Service to Serve Defendants by Attorney Boyce N. Richardson on behalf of Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons for Corporation, #2 Exhibit Summons for Individual, #3 Exhibit USM-285)(Richardson, Boyce)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JAB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, by Attorney Boyce N. Richardson on behalf of Eugene Scalia(Richardson, Boyce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Vasquez Drywall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasquez Drywall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Boyce N. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?