Lancaster v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Rebecca G. Lancaster
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03110
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by January 31, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Andrew P. Reitman on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company.(Reitman, Andrew)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Andrew P. Reitman on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company (Reitman, Andrew)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Keith M. Goman on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company (Goman, Keith)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Andrew P. Reitman on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reitman, Andrew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant BNSF Railway Company on 12/31/2019. (Sassaman, Shawn)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant BNSF Railway Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Plaintiff regarding Complaint, #1 . (Sassaman, Shawn)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Strike. Filing No. 3 is stricken as filed in error. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike Summons Requested #3 by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of Plaintiff Rebecca G. Lancaster.(Sassaman, Shawn)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 *STRICKEN* Summons Requested as to Plaintiff regarding Complaint, #1 . (Sassaman, Shawn) Modified on 12/27/2019 to strike per Text Order 5 (LKO).
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against BNSF Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4066229), by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of Rebecca Lancaster (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Sassaman, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Andrew P. Reitman
Represented By: Keith M. Goman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca G. Lancaster
Represented By: Shawn M. Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?