Bergman v. Dawson County, Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: James Bergman
Defendant: State of Nebraska, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Dawson County, Nebraska and Douglas County, Nebraska
Case Number: 4:2020cv03001
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE regarding Order to Show Cause, #8 by Attorney Benjamin N. White on behalf of Plaintiff James Bergman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(White, Benjamin)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - that plaintiff shall have until March 11, 2020 to show cause why the claims against the above-mentioned Defendants should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of the claims against the above-mentioned Defendants without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Dawson County, Nebraska (Freeman, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Travis W. Tettenborn on behalf of Defendant Correct Care Solutions, LLC.(Tettenborn, Travis)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Attorney Letter, #4 is stricken for the following reason(s): document filed in error. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 STRICKEN - ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joshua R. Woolf has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL) Modified on 1/3/2020 to strike per Order 5 (TCL).
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Correct Care Solutions, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand (check for filing fee will be hand-deliver to Lincoln office today 01/02/2020) against James Bergman from District Court of Douglas County, NE, Case number CI 19-8635 with attached state court pleadings, (filing fee $400, receipt number 4007765) by Attorney Thomas J. Freeman on behalf of County of Dawson, NE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to notice of removal)(Freeman, Thomas) Modified on 1/2/2020 to add receipt number (LRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bergman v. Dawson County, Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bergman
Represented By: Benjamin N. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Phoebe L. Gydesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Travis W. Tettenborn
Represented By: Renee A. Eveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawson County, Nebraska
Represented By: Thomas J. Freeman
Represented By: Brandy R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County, Nebraska
Represented By: Tess M. Moyer
Represented By: Joshua R. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?