Hayes v. State of Nebraska et al
Petitioner: Richard Hayes
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of Nebraska and State of Nebraska
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2020cv03017
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The petition for writ of habeas corpus, Filing no. #1 , is dismissed without prejudice and the motion for hearing for motion of replevin, Filing no. 17 , is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall mail to Petitioner a Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (AO 242). The Petitioner shall complete the form in accordance with the instructions on the form and return it to the Clerk of Court for filing in this case (4:20CV3017). If the form is not received by the Clerk of Court by the close of business on Monday, April 6, 2020, this matter may be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #4 is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party.)(KLL)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 NON-PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Richard Hayes. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 RESTRICTED EXHIBITS regarding PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Richard Hayes. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 302, #2 Exhibit 303, #3 Exhibit 304)(LKO)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 RESTRICTED EXHIBITS regarding MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #4 on behalf of Petitioner Richard Hayes. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 202)(LKO)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION of Replevin and Request for Hearing on behalf of Petitioner Richard Hayes. (LKO)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Angie Koziol at the Lancaster County Jail. (LKO)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Richard Hayes. (KMM)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 (Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: March 16, 2020: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KMM)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Richard Hayes. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?