Doe I et al v. Pfeiffer et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe I, Jane Doe III and Jane Doe II
Defendant: Mark Pfeiffer and Estate of Kipp L. Pfeiffer
Case Number: 4:2020cv03022
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Estate of Kipp L. Pfeiffer. Waiver sent on 2/19/2020. (Napolitano, Susan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Mark Pfeiffer. Waiver sent on 2/19/2020. (Napolitano, Susan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendants Estate of Kipp L. Pfeiffer and Mark Pfeiffer. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Mark Pfeiffer as Personal Representative regarding Complaint #1 . (Napolitano, Susan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Napolitano, Susan)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion. Plaintiffs my proceed under the pseudonyms Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, and Jane Doe III. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
February 17, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEF in support of MOTION regarding Complaint #1 #2 by Attorney Susan M Napolitano on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III.(Napolitano, Susan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION regarding Complaint #1 by Attorney Susan M Napolitano on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III.(Napolitano, Susan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4114408), by Attorney Susan M Napolitano on behalf of Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III(Napolitano, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe I et al v. Pfeiffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe I
Represented By: Susan M Napolitano
Represented By: Christopher M. Ferdico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe III
Represented By: Susan M Napolitano
Represented By: Christopher M. Ferdico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe II
Represented By: Susan M Napolitano
Represented By: Christopher M. Ferdico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Kipp L. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?