Humphreys & Partners Architects, L.P. v. Stone Creek Villas, LLC
Plaintiff: Humphreys & Partners Architects, L.P.
Defendant: Stone Creek Villas, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv03041
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Stone Creek Villas, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant's deadline to file its answer or other response to the Complaint is extended to June 8, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading Out of Time by Attorney Casandra M. Langstaff on behalf of Defendant Stone Creek Villas, LLC.(Langstaff, Casandra)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Stone Creek Villas, LLC on 4/16/2020. (Lindstrom, Christopher)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Christopher D. Lindstrom on behalf of Plaintiff Humphreys & Partners Architects, L.P..(Lindstrom, Christopher)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Stone Creek Villas, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action filed on 4/6/2020 regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint #1 ). (LRM)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Humphreys & Partners Architects, L.P.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Lindstrom, Christopher)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Stone Creek Villas, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4142165), by Attorney Christopher D. Lindstrom on behalf of Humphreys & Partners Architects, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lindstrom, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphreys & Partners Architects, L.P. v. Stone Creek Villas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humphreys & Partners Architects, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher D. Lindstrom
Represented By: Timothy M. Dortch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Creek Villas, LLC
Represented By: Casandra M. Langstaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?