Acosta, Jr. et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Yanez, Abigail De Leon, Mildred Martinez Cabrera, Armando Zapata, Jr., Yessica De Leon, Ivico Acosta, Jr., Blanca Zapata, Joaquin Gaona, Yasmin Hernandez, Armando Zapata, Cristian Cruz Contreras, Jesus Medina and Karina Zapata
Defendant: Monsanto Company and Gulf Citrus Harvesting and Hauling, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03048
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Strike , or Alternatively, To Dismiss, Defendant Gulf Citrus's Affirmative Defenses #18 by Attorney David J. Stefany on behalf of Defendant Gulf Citrus Harvesting and Hauling, Inc..(Stefany, David)
June 17, 2020 Filing 24 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Brief, #22 is stricken for the following reason: the document is a duplicate of document number #23 . Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JAB)
June 16, 2020 Filing 23 BRIEF in support of Motion to Strike, or Alternatively, to Dismiss, Defendant Monsanto's Affirmative Defenses by Attorney Amanda A. McMahon on behalf of Plaintiffs Ivico Acosta, Jr., Cristian Cruz Contreras, Abigail De Leon, Yessica De Leon, Joaquin Gaona, Yasmin Hernandez, Mildred Martinez Cabrera, Jesus Medina, Guadalupe Yanez, Armando Zapata, Blanca Zapata, Karina Zapata, Armando Zapata, Jr..(McMahon, Amanda)
June 16, 2020 Filing 22 STRICKEN - BRIEF in support of Motion to Strike, or Alternatively, to Dismiss, Defendant Monsanto's Affirmative Defenses by Attorney Amanda A. McMahon on behalf of Plaintiffs Ivico Acosta, Jr., Cristian Cruz Contreras, Abigail De Leon, Yessica De Leon, Joaquin Gaona, Yasmin Hernandez, Mildred Martinez Cabrera, Jesus Medina, Guadalupe Yanez, Armando Zapata, Blanca Zapata, Karina Zapata, Armando Zapata, Jr..(McMahon, Amanda) Modified on 6/17/2020 to add "stricken" text pursuant to Order 24 . (JAB)
June 16, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Strike by Attorney Amanda A. McMahon on behalf of Plaintiffs Ivico Acosta, Jr., Cristian Cruz Contreras, Abigail De Leon, Yessica De Leon, Joaquin Gaona, Yasmin Hernandez, Mildred Martinez Cabrera, Jesus Medina, Guadalupe Yanez, Armando Zapata, Blanca Zapata, Karina Zapata, Armando Zapata, Jr..(McMahon, Amanda)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that to avoid any delays in this case, If the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before July 1, 2020, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" located on the courts website at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. After all parties have signed this form, e-mail it in.pdf format to clerk@ned.uscourts.gov. Do not electronically file this form or submit it to chambers. In the absence of timely submitting the fully executed consent form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
June 10, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, or, Alternatively, to Dismiss, Defendant Gulf Citrus's Affirmative Defenses by Attorney Daniela Dwyer on behalf of Plaintiffs Ivico Acosta, Jr., Cristian Cruz Contreras, Abigail De Leon, Yessica De Leon, Joaquin Gaona, Yasmin Hernandez, Mildred Martinez Cabrera, Jesus Medina, Guadalupe Yanez, Armando Zapata, Blanca Zapata, Karina Zapata, Armando Zapata, Jr..(Dwyer, Daniela)
June 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike , or Alternatively, To Dismiss, Defendant Gulf Citrus's Affirmative Defenses by Attorney Daniela Dwyer on behalf of Plaintiffs Ivico Acosta, Jr., Cristian Cruz Contreras, Abigail De Leon, Yessica De Leon, Joaquin Gaona, Yasmin Hernandez, Mildred Martinez Cabrera, Jesus Medina, Guadalupe Yanez, Armando Zapata, Blanca Zapata, Karina Zapata, Armando Zapata, Jr..(Dwyer, Daniela)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David J. Stefany on behalf of Defendant Gulf Citrus Harvesting and Hauling, Inc..(Stefany, David)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. by Attorney Clifford A. Godiner on behalf of Defendants Monsanto Company, Bayer AG, Bayer AG.(Godiner, Clifford)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Monsanto Company (Godiner, Clifford)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Gulf Citrus Harvesting and Hauling, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Gulf Citrus Harvesting and Hauling, Inc. (Stefany, David)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Gulf Citrus Harvesting and Hauling, Inc. on 5/1/2020. (McMahon, Amanda)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney David J. Stefany. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4157740 by Attorney David J Stefany on behalf of Defendant Gulf Citrus Harvesting and Hauling, Inc..(Stefany, David)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Monsanto Company on 5/4/2020. (McMahon, Amanda)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Gulf Citrus Harvesting and Hauling, Inc. and Monsanto Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Gulf Citrus Harvesting and Hauling, Inc. regarding Complaint,, #1 . (McMahon, Amanda)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Monsanto Company regarding Complaint,, #1 . (McMahon, Amanda)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Plaintiffs Ivico Acosta, Jr., et al. by Attorney Daniela Dwyer on behalf of Plaintiffs Mildred Martinez Cabrera, Guadalupe Yanez, Yasmin Hernandez, Abigail De Leon, Armando Zapata, Joaquin Gaona, Ivico Acosta, Jr., Armando Zapata, Jr., Karina Zapata, Blanca Zapata, Yessica De Leon, Jesus Medina, Cristian Cruz Contreras.(Dwyer, Daniela)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand Plaintiffs Ivico Acosta, Jr., et al. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4153506), by Attorney Daniela Dwyer on behalf of Mildred Martinez Cabrera, Guadalupe Yanez, Yasmin Hernandez, Abigail De Leon, Armando Zapata, Joaquin Gaona, Ivico Acosta, Jr., Armando Zapata, Jr., Karina Zapata, Blanca Zapata, Yessica De Leon, Jesus Medina, Cristian Cruz Contreras (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017 Job Clearance Order, #2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement to Detassel, #3 Exhibit C - Delayed Start Date Notice)(Dwyer, Daniela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta, Jr. et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Yanez
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail De Leon
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Martinez Cabrera
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Zapata, Jr.
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yessica De Leon
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivico Acosta, Jr.
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Zapata
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Gaona
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasmin Hernandez
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Zapata
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Cruz Contreras
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Medina
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Zapata
Represented By: Daniela Dwyer
Represented By: Grace Kube
Represented By: Amanda A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Citrus Harvesting and Hauling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?