Gillett v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Steven C. Gillett
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company and Burlington Northern and Santa Fe Railway Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv03120
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due January 21, 2022. Status Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of Plaintiff Steven C. Gillett.(Sassaman, Shawn)
November 20, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #15 for attorney Stephanie Boutsicaris. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4284127 by Attorney Stephanie Boutsicaris on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company.(Boutsicaris, Stephanie)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Keith M. Goman on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company (Goman, Keith)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William Floyd on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company (Floyd, William)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/15/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #9 for attorney William Floyd. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4279243 by Attorney William Floyd on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company.(Floyd, William)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of DEFENDANT BNSFS REQUEST FOR TRIAL LOCATION by Attorney Andrew P. Reitman on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company (Reitman, Andrew)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Andrew P. Reitman on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company.(Reitman, Andrew)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by BNSF Railway Company (Reitman, Andrew)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant BNSF Railway Company on 10/23/2020. (Sassaman, Shawn)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant BNSF Railway Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MLF)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Plaintiff regarding Complaint #1 . (Sassaman, Shawn)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against BNSF Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4254992), by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of Steven Gillett (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sassaman, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillett v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Stephanie Boutsicaris
Represented By: Andrew P. Reitman
Represented By: William Floyd
Represented By: Keith M. Goman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Northern and Santa Fe Railway Company
Represented By: Stephanie Boutsicaris
Represented By: Andrew P. Reitman
Represented By: William Floyd
Represented By: Keith M. Goman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C. Gillett
Represented By: Shawn M. Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?