Benson et al v. Friesen et al
Plaintiff: Fredie E. Benson and Maria T. Benson
Defendant: Binger Trucking Inc., Andrew L. Friesen, Brandon Stradley and Consolidated Concrete Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv03121
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1364
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE by Attorney Bradford J. Griffin on behalf of Plaintiffs Fredie E. Benson, Maria T. Benson.(Griffin, Bradford)
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE by Attorney Bradford J. Griffin on behalf of Plaintiffs Fredie E. Benson, Maria T. Benson.(Griffin, Bradford)
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Consolidated Concrete Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Binger Trucking Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/7/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Binger Trucking Inc., Brandon Stradley (Gealy, Stephen)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER The Plaintiff has not responded to Defendant Binger Trucking Inc. and Defendant Brandon Stradley's motion to extend the responsive pleading deadline, and the deadline for responding has passed. The motion is deemed unopposed. Defendants' motion (Filing No. #6 ) is granted. Binger Trucking Inc. and Brandon Stradley shall file answers or other responsive pleadings on or before December 4, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
November 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Binger Trucking Inc. on 10/24/2020; Consolidated Concrete Company on 10/27/2020; Andrew L. Friesen on 10/24/2020; Brandon Stradley on 10/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Summons for Consolidated Concrete, #2 Affidavit Summons for Frisen, #3 Affidavit Summons for Binger Truckingg)(Griffin, Bradford)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Consolidated Concrete Company, Andrew L. Friesen (Ahl, Stephen)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Binger Trucking Inc., Brandon Stradley.(Gealy, Stephen)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Binger Trucking Inc., Consolidated Concrete Company, Andrew L. Friesen, Brandon Stradley. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons for Brandon Stradley, #2 Summons for Consolidates Concrete, #3 Summons for Binger Trucking Inc.)(Griffin, Bradford)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to ANDREW L. FRIESEN, CONSOLIDATED CONCRETE COMPANY, BRANDON STRADLEY, and BINGER TRUCKING INC. regarding Complaint #1 . (Griffin, Bradford)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against FREDIE E BENSON, MARIE T. BENSON ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4256728)FREDIE E BENSON, MARIE T. BENSON(Griffin, Bradford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson et al v. Friesen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binger Trucking Inc.
Represented By: Stephen S. Gealy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew L. Friesen
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Stradley
Represented By: Stephen S. Gealy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Concrete Company
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredie E. Benson
Represented By: Bradford J. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria T. Benson
Represented By: Bradford J. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?