Huntley v. Watts Electric Company
Plaintiff: Ryan S. Huntley
Defendant: Watts Electric Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv03002
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Service by Attorney Jerry L. Pigsley on behalf of Defendant Watts Electric Company.(Pigsley, Jerry)
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Jennifer L. Turco Meyer on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan S. Huntley (Turco Meyer, Jennifer)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order in their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report, (Filing No. #8 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 12/14/21. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on December 17, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jennifer L. Turco Meyer on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan S. Huntley.(Turco Meyer, Jennifer)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jerry L. Pigsley on behalf of Defendant Watts Electric Company.(Pigsley, Jerry)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/19/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Watts Electric Company (Pigsley, Jerry)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Watts Electric Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MKR)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (MKR)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Ryan S Huntley from Lancaster County District Court, Case number CI 20-4463 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4313358) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jerry L. Pigsley on behalf of Watts Electric Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pigsley, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntley v. Watts Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan S. Huntley
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Electric Company
Represented By: Jerry L. Pigsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?