Harris v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Edith A. Harris
Defendant: Alcon Research, LLC, Alcon Research, LTD, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Ag, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited and Novartis Pharma AG
Case Number: 4:2021cv03013
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 33 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #32 is stricken for the following reason: document filed in incorrect case. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM)
March 9, 2021 Filing 32 STRICKEN MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Huffer, Michael) Modified on 3/9/2021 to add the word stricken (LRM).
March 9, 2021 Filing 31 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #30 by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Huffer, Michael)
March 9, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Huffer, Michael)
March 9, 2021 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York Corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss Company, Corporate Parent Novartis AG, a Swiss company, whose shares are publicly traded on the Six Swiss Exchange, and whose American Depository Shares are publicly traded on the New York Stock Exchange for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York Corporation, Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss Company, Novartis AG, a Swiss company, whose shares are publicly traded on the Six Swiss Exchange, and whose American Depository Shares are publicly traded on the New York Stock Exchange.(Huffer, Michael)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER approving #27 Stipulation for Dismissal. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
March 9, 2021 Filing 27 UNOPPOSED STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Ag, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited.(Huffer, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion to Extend. As to all defendants who have a March 9, 2021 answer or response deadline, the deadline for filing corporate disclosures is extended to March 9, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
March 5, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Extend Time to File Corporate Disclosure by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Huffer, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Carter F. Thurman on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Thurman, Carter)
March 5, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Robert Johnston on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Johnston, Robert)
March 5, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Shannon N. Proctor on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Proctor, Shannon)
February 18, 2021 Filing 21 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Alcon Research, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
February 18, 2021 Filing 20 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
February 18, 2021 Filing 19 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
February 18, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #17 for attorney Matthew Malinowski. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
February 18, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4340164 by Attorney Matthew Malinowski on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Ag, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited.(Malinowski, Matthew)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. As to all defendants, the deadline for answering or responding to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to March 9, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Huffer, Michael)
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kathryn J. Cheatle on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Cheatle, Kathryn)
February 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ronald F. Krause on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Krause, Ronald)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Alcon Research, LLC on 2/11/2021. (Bogle, Brandon)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation on 2/11/2021. (Bogle, Brandon)
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation regarding Complaint #1 . (Bogle, Brandon)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Bogle, Brandon)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc. on 1/26/2021. (Bogle, Brandon)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation regarding Complaint #1 . (Bogle, Brandon)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Bogle, Brandon)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Alcon Research, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Bogle, Brandon)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4319787), by Attorney Brandon Bogle on behalf of Edith Harris(Bogle, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Research, LLC
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Robert Johnston
Represented By: Kathryn J. Cheatle
Represented By: Shannon N. Proctor
Represented By: Carter F. Thurman
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Research, LTD
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Robert Johnston
Represented By: Kathryn J. Cheatle
Represented By: Shannon N. Proctor
Represented By: Carter F. Thurman
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Robert Johnston
Represented By: Kathryn J. Cheatle
Represented By: Shannon N. Proctor
Represented By: Carter F. Thurman
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Ag
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Robert Johnston
Represented By: Kathryn J. Cheatle
Represented By: Shannon N. Proctor
Represented By: Carter F. Thurman
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharma AG
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith A. Harris
Represented By: Brandon Bogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?