Deinert et al v. Portable Storage of Nebraska, LLC
Plaintiff: Seth Deinhert, Samantha Deinhert, Seth Deinert and Samantha Deinert
Defendant: PODS Enterprises,LLC and Portable Storage of Nebraska LLC a Nebraska Limited Liability Company doing business as PODS
Case Number: 4:2021cv03016
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Zachary W. Lutz-Priefert on behalf of Defendant Portable Storage of Nebraska LLC.(Lutz-Priefert, Zachary)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/16/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by PODS Enterprises,LLC (Lutz-Priefert, Zachary)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Portable Storage of Nebraska LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Portable Storage of Nebraska LLC (Lutz-Priefert, Zachary)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant PODS Enterprises,LLC. Waiver sent on 1/21/2021. (Collingham, Carey)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Portable Storage of Nebraska LLC, PODS Enterprises,LLC Portable Storage of Nebraska LLC, Samantha Deinhert, PODS Enterprises,LLC, Seth Deinhert (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4320896)(Collingham, Carey) Modified on 1/21/2021 to add the receipt number (LRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deinert et al v. Portable Storage of Nebraska, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PODS Enterprises,LLC
Represented By: Zachary W. Lutz-Priefert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portable Storage of Nebraska LLC a Nebraska Limited Liability Company doing business as PODS
Represented By: Zachary W. Lutz-Priefert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Deinhert
Represented By: Carey D. Collingham
Represented By: Christopher M. Ferdico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Deinhert
Represented By: Carey D. Collingham
Represented By: Christopher M. Ferdico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Deinert
Represented By: Carey D. Collingham
Represented By: Christopher M. Ferdico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Deinert
Represented By: Carey D. Collingham
Represented By: Christopher M. Ferdico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?