Poole et al v. Lincoln et al
Plaintiff: Elise Poole and Jackie Buntgen
Defendant: City of Lincoln, Lancaster County, Terry Wagner, Jeff Bliemeister and Officers Jane or John Does
Case Number: 4:2021cv03030
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - If the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before April 23, 2021, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" located on the court's website at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. After all parties have signed this form, e-mail it in.pdf format to clerk@ned.uscourts.gov. Do not electronically file this form or submit it to chambers. In the absence of timely submitting the fully executed consent form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
April 1, 2021 Filing 18 BRIEF in support of by Attorney Daniel J. Zieg on behalf of Defendants Lancaster County, Terry Wagner.(Zieg, Daniel)
April 1, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss (, ), MOTION to Strike (, ) by Attorney Daniel J. Zieg on behalf of Defendants Lancaster County, Terry Wagner.(Zieg, Daniel)
February 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Daniel J. Zieg on behalf of Defendants Lancaster County, Terry Wagner (Zieg, Daniel)
February 18, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon (Zieg, Daniel)
February 18, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon (Zieg, Daniel)
February 9, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Lancaster County on 2/5/2021. (Gutman, Daniel)
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Terry Wagner on 2/5/2021. (Gutman, Daniel)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Jeff Bliemeister. Waiver sent on 2/2/2021. (Rowley, Danielle)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant City of Lincoln. Waiver sent on 2/2/2021. (Littrell, Abigail)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to defendants Jeff Bliemeister, Lancaster County, City of Lincoln, and Terry Wagner. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Jeffrey Bliemeister regarding Complaint #1 . (Sipple, Adam)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to City of Lincoln regarding Complaint #1 . (Sipple, Adam)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Terry Wagner regarding Complaint #1 . (Sipple, Adam)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Lancaster County regarding Complaint #1 . (Sipple, Adam)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to City of Lincoln, County of Lancaster, Jeffrey Bliemeister and Terry Wagner regarding Complaint #1 . (Sipple, Adam)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jonathan H. Latka has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand on behalf of Elise Poole and Jackie Buntgen against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4329570), by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Elise Poole(Sipple, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poole et al v. Lincoln et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lincoln
Represented By: Abigail F. Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County
Represented By: Daniel J. Zieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Wagner
Represented By: Daniel J. Zieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bliemeister
Represented By: Danielle L. Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officers Jane or John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Poole
Represented By: Jonathan H. Latka
Represented By: Daniel J. Gutman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Represented By: Jonathon Latka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Buntgen
Represented By: Jonathan H. Latka
Represented By: Daniel J. Gutman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Represented By: Jonathon Latka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?