Webb v. State of Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: Yohan Webb
Defendant: Jeff Bliemeister, State of Nebraska, Gaylor Baird and Pete Ricketts
Case Number: 4:2021cv03031
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for New Judge on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (LKO)
March 11, 2021 TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Yohan Webb on 03/11/2021. Receipt number 8059524, in the amount of $.01. (LRM)
March 10, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Pay Initial Filing Fee (Filing #19 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $.01 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 7, 2021: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party & plaintiff's institution)(LKO)
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Extend #19 on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Extend Time to Pay Initial Filing Fee on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
February 18, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER with Clerk's response on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LRM)
February 18, 2021 Filing 17 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Discovery #16 on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
February 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Discovery on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $.01 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 19, 2021: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party & plaintiff's institution)(LKO)
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Clarification on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to file under Seal on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb.(TCL)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Yohan Webb. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE to take Judicial Notice on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Lancaster County Corrections. (LKO)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE and Supplement on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Supplement on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb.(LKO)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb.(LKO)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Gaylor Baird, Jeff Bliemeister, Pete Ricketts, and State of Nebraska filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bliemeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylor Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yohan Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?