Peter v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Peter
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc. and Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv03059
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due January 13, 2022. Status Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
April 23, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM)
April 22, 2021 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Peter.(Stecklein, Alan)
April 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of service of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Ally Financial Inc. by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Peter (Stecklein, Alan)
April 14, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of of Service of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Peter (Stecklein, Alan)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - CONSENT Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
March 17, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Ally Financial Inc. (Ostroff, Ethan)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Gutman, Daniel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #13 for attorney Callie Barr. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Callie M. Barr Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4357692 by Attorney Callie Barr on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Barr, Callie)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Ethan G. Ostroff on behalf of Defendant Ally Financial Inc..(Ostroff, Ethan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney Matthew S. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Peter.(Robertson, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Samuel E. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Peter (Miller, Samuel)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew S. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Peter (Robertson, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Peter (Stecklein, Alan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Michael H. Rapp on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Peter (Rapp, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Inc.. by Attorney Daniel J. Gutman on behalf of Defendants Experian Information Solutions Inc., Experian plc.(Gutman, Daniel)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Ally Financial Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Callie Barr has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGESASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Scott Peter from Lancaster County District Court, Case number CI 21-585 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4356102) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Daniel J. Gutman on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gutman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peter v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Ethan G. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Gutman
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Represented By: Callie Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Peter
Represented By: Tregg R. Lunn
Represented By: Matthew S. Robertson
Represented By: Michael H. Rapp
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Represented By: Samuel E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?