Vanwinkle v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gary Eugene Vanwinkle
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv03072
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Commissioner of Social Security on 5/3/2021. (Wicklund, Edward)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #3 for attorney Edward A. Wicklund. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security, United States Attorney, and United States Attorney General. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing No. #4 ). is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file the original complaint and accompanying pleadings without the prepayment of costs or fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2015-05: In the Matter of Procedures for Social Security Cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LRM)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Attorney Edward A. Wicklund on behalf of Plaintiff Gary Eugene Vanwinkle.(Wicklund, Edward)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4374858 by Attorney Edward A. Wicklund on behalf of Plaintiff Gary Eugene Vanwinkle.(Wicklund, Edward)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Commissioner of Social Security regarding Complaint, #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Wicklund, Edward)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, by Attorney Edward A. Wicklund on behalf of Gary Eugene Vanwinkle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk)(Wicklund, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanwinkle v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Eugene Vanwinkle
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?