Madsen v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gary Madsen
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv03094
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Attorney Ryan J. Coufal on behalf of Plaintiff Gary Madsen (Coufal, Ryan)
June 14, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Initial Disclosure by Attorney Leslie S. Stryker on behalf of Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Stryker, Leslie)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Leslie S. Stryker on behalf of Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Stryker, Leslie)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due April 1, 2022. Status Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Ryan J. Coufal on behalf of Plaintiff Gary Madsen.(Coufal, Ryan)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER that the filing fee in the amount of $402.00 is refunded to the payor, Leslie Stryker, receipt number ANEDC-4393113. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (DKM)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER - CONSENT- Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 6/10/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Stryker, Leslie)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Gary Madsen from District Court Douglas County, Case number CI 21-3320 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNEDC-4393113) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Leslie S. Stryker on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stryker, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madsen v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Madsen
Represented By: Gretchen L. McGill
Represented By: Ryan J. Coufal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian D. Nolan
Represented By: Leslie S. Stryker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?