Nichols v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kharidja A. Nichols
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv03139
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $402.00 filing and administrative fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: October 13, 2021 Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - A consent to exercise of jurisdiction by the United States Magistrate Judge has not been filed. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c); NECivR 73.1(a). Accordingly, pursuant to NECivR 73.1(a), this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Richard G. Kopf for disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (MKR)
August 19, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #13 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Social Security Administration.(Wagner, Lynnett)
August 19, 2021 Filing 14 INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss #13 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lesha Cowell)(Wagner, Lynnett)
August 19, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Social Security Administration.(Wagner, Lynnett)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Kharidja A. Nichols regarding Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 10 . Mail resent to 3031 South 70th Street Apartment 102 Omaha, NE 68106. (MKR)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Kharidja A. Nichols regarding Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) #3 and Order - Social Security GO 2015-05 #4 Mail resent to 3031 South 70th Street Apartment 102 Omaha, NE 68106. (MKR)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Set Answer Date. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 20, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Robert C. Bigler is terminated as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Set Answer Date by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Social Security Administration.(Wagner, Lynnett)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Social Security Administration.(Wagner, Lynnett)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert C. Bigler has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE that in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2015-05: In the Matter of Procedures for Social Security Cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 Transmittal Letter from USCA - Federal Circuit (21-1865) regarding Social Security Appeal #1 . (Attachments: #1 Order Directing Parties, #2 Entry of Appearance, #3 Motion of Respondent and Declaration, #4 Document No. 1 mailed to Petitioner, #5 Order Granting Motion to Extend, #6 Document No. 2 mailed to Petitioner, #7 Response of Respondent, #8 Order Terminating Appeal and Transferring to USDC - Nebraksa) (LKO)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Kharidja A. Nichols. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kharidja A. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Robert C. Bigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Represented By: Robert C. Bigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?