Merit Mechanical, Inc. v. Houston Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Merit Mechanical, Inc.
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv03153
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Affirmative Defenses to Its Counterclaim by Attorney Alexander Ross on behalf of Defendant Houston Casualty Company.(Ross, Alexander)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/13/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Counterclaim and Demand for Jury Trial by Merit Mechanical, Inc. (Heusinger, Joel)
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #8 for attorney Alexander Ross. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4469125 by Attorney Alexander Ross on behalf of Defendant Houston Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificates of Good Standing)(Ross, Alexander)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Audrey R. Svane on behalf of Counter Defendant Merit Mechanical, Inc., Plaintiff Merit Mechanical, Inc..(Svane, Audrey)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against Merit Mechanical, Inc. regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 filed by Houston Casualty Company by Houston Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint) (Keith, Robert)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Illium, Inc. (DE), Corporate Parent Illium, Inc. (DE), Corporate Parent HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (DE), Corporate Parent HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (DE) for Houston Casualty Company. by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Defendants Houston Casualty Company, Illium, Inc. (DE), Illium, Inc. (DE), HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (DE), HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (DE), Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc..(Keith, Robert)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Merit Mechanical, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Houston Casualty Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Merit Mechanical, Inc. from District Court of Lancaster County, NE, Case number CI 21-2986 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4453727) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Houston Casualty Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint & Praecipe, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Service Return)(Keith, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merit Mechanical, Inc. v. Houston Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merit Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: Audrey R. Svane
Represented By: Joel D. Heusinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert S. Keith
Represented By: Alexander Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?