Weisenberger v. Ameritas Mutual Holding Company
Plaintiff: Cynthia Weisenberger
Defendant: Ameritas Mutual Holding Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv03156
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Standing #10 by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Ameritas Mutual Holding Company.(Buter, Victoria)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Standing by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Ameritas Mutual Holding Company.(Buter, Victoria)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Ameritas Mutual Holding Company.(Buter, Victoria)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Ameritas Mutual Holding Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 13, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Ameritas Mutual Holding Company.(Buter, Victoria)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ameritas Mutual Holding Company on 8/18/2021. (Powers, Vincent)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Ameritas Mutual Holding Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Ameritas Mutual Holding Company regarding Complaint #1 . (Powers, Vincent)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ameritas Mutual Holding Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4458020), by Attorney Vincent M. Powers on behalf of Cynthia Weisenberger(Powers, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisenberger v. Ameritas Mutual Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Weisenberger
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Nicholas Migliaccio
Represented By: Vincent M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameritas Mutual Holding Company
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?