Lyons v. York County Board of Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: John J. Lyons
Defendant: York County Board of Commissioners, Daniel Grotz, Kurt Bulgrin, Bill Bamesberger, Randy Obermier and Jack Sikes
Case Number: 4:2021cv03296
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The Rule 26(f) Report deadline is continued. Plaintiff shall file the anticipated Rule 12(c) motion on or before January 3, 2022. Should Plaintiff elect not to do so, Plaintiff's counsel shall notify Defendants' counsel and the parties shall prepare and submit their Rule 26(f) report within twenty-one (21) days after such notification. The clerk shall set an internal case management deadline of January 3, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 REPLY to Counterclaim by John J. Lyons (Lopez, David)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against John J. Lyons regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 filed by Randy Obermier, Bill Bamesberger, Kurt Bulgrin, Jack Sikes, York County Board of Commissioners, Daniel Grotz by York County Board of Commissioners, Daniel Grotz, Kurt Bulgrin, Jack Sikes, Randy Obermier, Bill Bamesberger (Ebeler Rolf, Erin)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of York County, Nebraska, Case number CI 21-143 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4502496) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Erin Ebeler Rolf on behalf of York County Board of Commissioners, Daniel Grotz, Kurt Bulgrin, Jack Sikes, Randy Obermier, Bill Bamesberger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion for Temporary Injunction and/or TRO, #3 Exhibit 3 - Praecipes and Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Service Returns, #5 Exhibit 5 - Judicial Recusal and Assignment)(Ebeler Rolf, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. York County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Lyons
Represented By: Alexa B. Barton
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Erin Ebeler Rolf
Represented By: Pamela J. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Grotz
Represented By: Erin Ebeler Rolf
Represented By: Pamela J. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Bulgrin
Represented By: Erin Ebeler Rolf
Represented By: Pamela J. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Bamesberger
Represented By: Erin Ebeler Rolf
Represented By: Pamela J. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Obermier
Represented By: Erin Ebeler Rolf
Represented By: Pamela J. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Sikes
Represented By: Erin Ebeler Rolf
Represented By: Pamela J. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?