Thompson et al v. Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Plaintiff: Gerald Thompson and Cynthia Johnson
Defendant: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation and WorldMark
Case Number: 4:2021cv03305
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by January 21, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
December 27, 2021 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Amended Complaint by Attorney Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants WorldMark, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation.(Sharp, Darren)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss. In light of #11 plaintiffs' amended complaint, the defendant's motion to dismiss #6 is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, WorldMark, by Attorney George G. Vinton on behalf of Gerald Thompson, Cynthia Johnson(Vinton, George)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to extend (filing #9 ) is granted. On or before December 21, 2021, the plaintiffs may either respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss (filing #6 ) or file an amended complaint. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney George G. Vinton on behalf of Plaintiffs Cynthia Johnson, Gerald Thompson.(Vinton, George)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 INDEX in support of Brief #7 Exhibits to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Declaration of Stacey Jagielski, #2 Exhibit B- Declaration of Theresa Orben, #3 Exhibit B-1 - December 7, 2017 Contract, #4 Exhibit B-2 - March 7, 2018 Contract)(Sharp, Darren)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction over Defendant #6 by Attorney Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation.(Sharp, Darren)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction over Defendant by Attorney Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation.(Sharp, Darren)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Corporate Parent Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Corporate Parent Travel + Leisure Co., f.k.a. Wyndham Destinations, Inc., Corporate Parent Travel + Leisure Co., f.k.a. Wyndham Destinations, Inc. for. by Attorney Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Travel + Leisure Co., f.k.a. Wyndham Destinations, Inc., Travel + Leisure Co., f.k.a. Wyndham Destinations, Inc..(Sharp, Darren)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Proof of Filing in State Court by Attorney Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to State Court of Removal)(Sharp, Darren)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Cynthia Johnson, Gerald Thompson from District Court of Lincoln County, Nebraska, Case number CI 21 628 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4510608) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Wyndham Resort Development Corporation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court File)(Sharp, Darren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Thompson
Represented By: George G. Vinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Johnson
Represented By: George G. Vinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Represented By: Darren K. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WorldMark
Represented By: Darren K. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?