Herrick v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Jesse Herrick
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv03181
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before December 15, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TMM)
October 28, 2022 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney James Monagle on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(Monagle, James)
October 20, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #15 for attorney James Monagle. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 20, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4736946 by Attorney James Monagle on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(Monagle, James)
October 20, 2022 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #13 for attorney Claudia D. McCarron. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 20, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4736787 by Attorney Claudia D. McCarron on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(McCarron, Claudia)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - In the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to District Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (LKO)
September 9, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney Jonathan T. Deters. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 9, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Terence R. Coates. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 8, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC. Waiver sent on 9/1/2022. (Klinger, Gary)
September 1, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4703974 by Attorney Jonathan T. Deters on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Herrick.(Deters, Jonathan)
August 30, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4702561 by Attorney Terence R. Coates on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Herrick.(Coates, Terence)
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Nelnet Servicing, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Klinger, Gary)
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jonathan T. Deters has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
August 30, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Terence R. Coates has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
August 30, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Nelnet Servicing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4702114), by Attorney Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Jesse Herrick (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 proposed summons)(Klinger, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrick v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Herrick
Represented By: David K. Lietz
Represented By: Jonathan T. Deters
Represented By: Terence R. Coates
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Claudia D. McCarron
Represented By: James Monagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?