Eichenblatt v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Max Eichenblatt
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv03227
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER For good cause shown, the answer deadline is extended to January 17, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
December 6, 2022 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney James Monagle on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(Monagle, James)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before December 15, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TMM)
November 3, 2022 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC for Nelnet Servicing, LLC. by Attorney James Monagle on behalf of Defendants Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC.(Monagle, James)
October 25, 2022 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #20 for attorney Edmund A. Normand. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 24, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edmund A. Normand Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4738573 by Attorney Edmund A. Normand on behalf of Plaintiff Max Eichenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Admission)(Normand, Edmund)
October 21, 2022 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER regarding Pro Hac Vice admission fee in the amount of $100.00 is refunded to the payor, Joshua R. Jacobson, receipt number ANEDC-4731327 and Pro Hac Vice admission fee in the amount of $100.00 is refunded to the payor, Joshua R. Jacobson, receipt number ANEDC-4731349. These payments did not appear on the docket sheet, however, they did process through pay.gov. Both are refunded because the attorney is admitted full-time. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Francis M. McDonald and Sarah A. Long are withdrawn as counsel for Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC. and will no longer receive ECF notifications in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TMM)
October 20, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Francis M. McDonald, Jr. and Sarah A. Long) by Attorney Charles F. Kaplan on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(Kaplan, Charles)
October 19, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Charles F. Kaplan on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC (Kaplan, Charles)
October 14, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Refund of paid electronically ANEDC-4731327, MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua R. Jacobson Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4731349 by Attorney Joshua R. Jacobson on behalf of Plaintiff Max Eichenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Certificate from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska)(Jacobson, Joshua)
October 12, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Sarah Anne Long has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
October 12, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Francis Morton McDonald has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
October 12, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joshua Robert Jacobson has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
October 12, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Edmund A. Normand has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
October 12, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 12, 2022 Remark - Public (Related Case): This notice serves to advise the parties that pursuant to direction from Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., this case is related to 4:22cv3181 and assigned to District Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Any challenge to this assignment must be made pursuant to NEGenR 1.4(a)(7). (LRM)
October 11, 2022 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:22-cv-01794. Original electronic file received.
October 6, 2022 Filing 8 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to the District of Nebraska, Lincoln Divsion. (RPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/11/2022.]
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion to Transfer Case. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court, District of Nebraska, Lincoln Division, for all further proceedings and to close this file. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/6/2022. (MEH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/11/2022.]
October 5, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 15, 2022, to File Answer re #1 Complaint/Notice of Removal, or Otherwise Respond by Nelnet Services, LLC. (Long, Sarah) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified on 10/6/2022 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/11/2022.]
October 5, 2022 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Nebraska Where Related Cases are Pending by Nelnet Services, LLC. (Long, Sarah) Modified on 10/6/2022 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/11/2022.]
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/5/2022. (MEH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/11/2022.]
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/5/2022. (MEH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/11/2022.]
October 3, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-01794-CEM-LHP. (APV) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/11/2022.]
October 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2022-CA-008239-O filed in State Court on 9/7/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-20049724 filed by Nelnet Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exh. A , #2 State Court Docket Sheet , #3 State Court Other Documents Exh B , #4 Civil Cover Sheet )(Long, Sarah) Modified on 10/4/2022 to edit docket text (SRD). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/11/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eichenblatt v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Eichenblatt
Represented By: Edmund A. Normand
Represented By: Joshua Robert Jacobson
Represented By: Joshua R. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Francis Morton McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Long
Represented By: Charles F. Kaplan
Represented By: James Monagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?