Brouseau v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Beattie Brouseau
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv03056
Filed: April 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2023 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Motion to Dismiss to be Treated as Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment) #4 by Attorney Christopher M. Schmidt on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(Schmidt, Christopher)
May 22, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF in opposition to motion for summary judgment and dismissal by Attorney Jonathan V. Rehm on behalf of Plaintiff Beattie Brouseau. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Response on statement of facts)(Rehm, Jonathan)
May 22, 2023 Filing 14 INDEX in opposition to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Jonathan V. Rehm on behalf of Plaintiff Beattie Brouseau. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jon Rehm, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit F, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Beattie Brouseau)(Rehm, Jonathan)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend filed by Beattie Brouseau. The plaintiff may respond to the defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #4 on or before May 22, 2023. The defendant may reply in support of its motion on or before June 12, 2023. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
May 8, 2023 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jonathan V. Rehm on behalf of Plaintiff Beattie Brouseau.(Rehm, Jonathan)
April 28, 2023 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Restrict Filing No. 9 pursuant to the E-Government Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
April 24, 2023 Filing 9 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act #8 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey)
April 24, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey)
April 24, 2023 Filing 7 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Motion to Dismiss to be Treated as Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment) #4 , Brief, #5 by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey)
April 24, 2023 Filing 6 STATEMENT regarding: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Motion to Dismiss to be Treated as Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment) #4 , Brief, #5 (Annotated Statement of Material Facts in Support of Its Partial Motion to Dismiss to be treated as Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment) by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey)
April 24, 2023 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Motion to Dismiss to be Treated as Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment) #4 by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey)
April 24, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Motion to Dismiss to be Treated as Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment) by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(Gerdes, Torrey)
April 19, 2023 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
April 17, 2023 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior District Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (NMW)
April 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Beattie Brouseau from District Court of Cass County, Nebraska, Case number CI 23-57 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4843543) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc.(Gerdes, Torrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brouseau v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beattie Brouseau
Represented By: Jonathan V. Rehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Susan M. Foster
Represented By: Torrey J. Gerdes
Represented By: Christopher M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?